Accounts and annual returns THE CLIFFORD CHARITY OXFORD

Charity number: 278587
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2023 14 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2022 13 March 2023 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2020 08 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2020 Not Required