Accounts and annual returns NATIONAL CONFERENCE OF PRIESTS OF ENGLAND AND WALES (R C )

Charity number: 278602
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 17 June 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 03 December 2009 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 03 December 2009 33 days late
Annual return 31 December 2007 30 July 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 30 July 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 31 May 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 31 May 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 25 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 25 September 2006 On Time