Trustees THE SOCIETY FOR LATIN AMERICAN STUDIES
Charity number: 278817

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MARIEKE RIETHOF | Chair | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Penny Miles | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Geoffrey William Maguire | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yaniedys Arencibia Coloma | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Bowskill | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catriona Jane McAllister | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karol Valderrama-Burgos | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebecca Heather Ogden | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Merchant | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.