Financial history ABILITY UK

Charity number: 278835
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009
Total gross income £359.11k £166.24k £51.15k £4.25k £1.34k
Total expenditure £330.89k £183.40k £36.16k £2.63k £1.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A