Accounts and annual returns JOHANN GUTENBERG LODGE NO 5593 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 279005
Charity reporting is overdue by 921 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 556 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 556 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 921 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 921 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 November 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 January 2021 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required