Financial history THE DOCTOR PHILIP WELCH CHARITY

Charity Number: 279430
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2016 04/04/2017 04/04/2018 04/04/2019 04/04/2020
Total gross income £7.32k £7.53k £7.73k £7.91k £8.06k
Total expenditure £3.56k £4.96k £5.87k £0 £801
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A