Financial history HERNE BAY UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 279449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.48k £17.13k £5.18k £5.04k £5.07k
Total expenditure £11.38k £12.76k £8.71k £6.11k £6.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A