Financial history STOKE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 279536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.75k £7.69k £17.62k £10.89k £4.45k
Total expenditure £10.42k £6.45k £6.03k £9.51k £7.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £13.49k £3.67k N/A