Financial history CORBY COMMUNITY ARTS ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 279972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £31.00k £41.49k £37.54k £46.85k £44.99k
Total expenditure £32.55k £32.25k £39.10k £41.42k £44.60k
Income from government contracts £100 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £6.49k £2.16k N/A £2.65k