Financial history THE BRITISH ASSOCIATION OF MONACO CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 280178
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 14/05/2010 14/05/2011 14/05/2012 14/05/2013 14/05/2014
Total gross income £1.15k £1.18k £986 £903 £233
Total expenditure £1.20k £1.13k £1.16k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A