Accounts and annual returns RAF MARHAM CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 280620
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2005 03 October 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 03 October 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 11 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 11 January 2005 On Time