Accounts and annual returns EMPLOYMENT FOR THE DISABLED

Charity Number: 280668
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2013 09 December 2014 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2012 14 June 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2011 21 May 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not Required