Accounts and annual returns THE INSTITUTE OF PAPER CONSERVATION

Charity number: 280888
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2005 21 November 2006 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 21 November 2006 114 days late
Annual return 30 September 2004 14 July 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 14 July 2005 On Time