Accounts and annual returns WALTHAM ABBEY CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 281209
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 17 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 18 September 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 07 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 07 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 04 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 04 August 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 07 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 07 September 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 18 August 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 22 July 2004 On Time