Governing document ABILITY NORTHANTS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH JUNE 1980, AS AMENDED ON 22ND JUNE 1989, 13TH SEPTEMBER 1999, 23 SEPTEMBER 2002 AND 10 OCTOBER 2003.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EQUAL OPPORTUNITIES FOR DISABLED PEOPLE IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY (I) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (II) RAISING AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES FACED BY, AND THE LEGAL RIGHTS OF, PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND TRAINING; (III) CREATING AND SUPPORTING AND LIAISING WITH BRANCHES OF THIS CHARITY, VOLUNTARY GROUPS, OTHER CHARITIES, COMMUNITY GROUPS AND OTHER PROJECTS IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE; (IV) PROMOTING EMPLOYMENT; (V) THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF INFORMATION SYSTEMS FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, THEIR CARERS AND ADVOCATES; (VI) THE PROVISION OF APPROPRIATE SERVICES AND EQUIPMENT TO ALLEVIATE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES.
Area of benefit
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.