Financial history NEWHAVEN PEACEHAVEN AND SEAFORD LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 281285
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £80.12k £5.83k £7.47k £14.47k £9.90k
Total expenditure £18.98k £85.67k £20.79k £23.99k £32.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A