Financial history PATANJALI CENTRE FOR CLASSICAL YOGA TRUST LONDON

Charity Number: 281312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £6.58k £4.37k £9.08k £6.07k £1.35k
Total expenditure £8.10k £4.22k £18.38k £5.83k £5.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A