Accounts and annual returns CROMHALL WITH CHARFIELD WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 281483
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2008 14 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2007 16 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2006 12 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2005 20 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2004 07 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 Not Required