Governing document TRURO HOSPITAL RADIO
Charity Number: 281568

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02/07/1980 AS AMENDED ON 06/02/2002 AS AMENDED ON 12/12/2003 AS AMENDED ON 19/12/2007 AS AMENDED ON 16/05/2010
Charitable objects
TO EXTEND AND IMPROVE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, INFIRMITY AND OLD AGE THROUGH HOSPITAL BROADCASTING AND ALLIED SERVICES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, TRURO AND SURROUNDING AREA
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.