Accounts and annual returns EUROPEAN RESEARCH INTO CONSUMER AFFAIRS

Charity number: 281678
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2008 11 November 2009 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 31 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 31 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 16 November 2007 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 30 October 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 31 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 31 October 2006 On Time