Accounts and annual returns THE LUDDESDOWNE BENEFACTORY

Charity number: 281699
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 July 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 09 May 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 23 May 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required