Accounts and annual returns THE COLLEGE OF PHARMACY PRACTICE

Charity number: 281771
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 02 April 2014 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 15 February 2013 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required