Financial history NEWBRIDGE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 281874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £15.10k £16.88k £9.90k £4.56k £12.57k
Total expenditure £10.82k £3.93k £7.82k £8.26k £13.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £16.57k N/A N/A N/A