Trustees ABINGDON MEMORIAL PARISH HALL IWERNE MINSTER
Charity Number: 281988

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DIANNE MARY BENFIELD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Monique Goodliffe | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Hale | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Andrews | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Christina Abbey | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rita May Lishman RML | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Eileen Hale | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Jane Le Prevost | Trustee | 19 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
William Arthur Evans | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith A Dutch | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Niels Anthony Kraunsoe | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL LE PREVOST | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.