Trustees PRESTON CAPES VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 282040
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christine Ivy Purcell Trustee 25 February 2025
None on record
Christine Jayne Wareing Trustee 16 October 2024
None on record
Andrew Bryan Sedman Trustee 10 June 2024
None on record
Victoria Louise Brooks Trustee 07 November 2023
None on record
Rachel Bracher Trustee 04 August 2021
None on record
Dr Andrew William Bracher Trustee 04 August 2021
None on record
Gerard Hoare Trustee 04 August 2021
None on record