Financial history THE BAROSSA TRUST (1981)

Charity Number: 282082
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2013 05/04/2014 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017
Total gross income £2.00k £2.80k £2.65k £3.30k £1.71k
Total expenditure £7.21k £2.15k £2.84k £3.27k £3.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A