Trustees GROVE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 282261
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Harrison Chair 30 November 2021
None on record
Janet Kingdon Trustee 17 April 2024
None on record
Sheila James Trustee 01 February 2023
None on record
Tracy Strain Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Caroline Stead Trustee 01 May 2016
None on record