Accounts and annual returns GINGERBREAD (AN ASSOCIATION FOR ONE PARENT FAMILIES) LIMITED

Charity number: 282512
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 21 February 2008 21 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 09 February 2007 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 16 August 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 29 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 13 September 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 30 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 30 November 2004 On Time