Financial history THE CHEVIOT TRUST FUND

Charity number: 282570
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2013 04/04/2014 04/04/2015 04/04/2016 04/04/2017
Total gross income £10 £20 £2.98k £650 £89
Total expenditure £15 £15 £1.85k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A