Accounts and annual returns VITA NOVA CHOIR

Charity number: 282577
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required