Financial history OGLETHORPE W I

Charity Number: 283060
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.55k £2.18k £510 £1.70k £2.13k
Total expenditure £3.42k £1.94k £573 £1.87k £1.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A