Financial history BIX AND ASSENDON VILLAGE HALL COMMITTEE

Charity number: 283061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £16.34k £10.90k £12.93k £13.70k £15.10k
Total expenditure £6.53k £6.28k £13.87k £25.98k £10.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A