Accounts and annual returns W J HOUSE/SKELMERSDALE LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity number: 283208
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2015 | 13 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2014 | 16 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2014 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window