Financial history BANWELL BUDDIES

Charity Number: 283326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £77.35k £77.20k £84.41k £90.80k £79.34k
Total expenditure £71.22k £67.82k £78.50k £85.69k £74.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £9.01k £2.92k N/A N/A