Governing document ARTHUR RANK HOUSE HOSPICE CHARITY

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JANUARY 1982, AS AMENDED 2 JULY 1993, 16 JUNE 1998, 29 JUNE 2004, AND BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 24 AUGUST 2004.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS, AND OTHERWISE SUPPORT THE WORK OF ARTHUR RANK HOUSE AND THE UNIT FOR THE CARE OF THE ELDERLY, AT BROOKFIELDS HOSPITAL, BY ANY MEANS THAT ARE CHARITABLE AND TO INCLUDE THE PROVISION OF ADDITIONAL SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR PATIENTS AND STAFF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.