Accounts and annual returns LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF ST VINCENT'S ORTHOPAEDIC HOSPITAL

Charity number: 283490
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 24 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 25 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 12 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2004 18 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not Required