Trustees BISLEY WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity Number: 283913

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TINA GULL | Chair | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE EVANS | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
TINA HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
KAREN MIMMS | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ELLIS | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY KNELLER | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
LADY SUSAN LEIGH | Trustee | 11 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN VAUGHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH AUDREY COLVIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAMELA SUTTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA GWENDOLINE ROTHWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.