Financial history HEVINGHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 283915
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.27k £24.04k £17.35k £14.50k £1.21k
Total expenditure £11.34k £8.76k £7.56k £20.01k £4.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.91k £8.00k N/A N/A