Accounts and annual returns THE HEADLIGHT FOUNDATION (ALSO KNOWN AS THE JEFFREY KELSON FOUNDATION)

Charity number: 283930
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 19 August 2024 07 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 August 2024 07 October 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required