Financial history TAMAR VALLEY HEALTH CENTRE

Charity number: 283946
Charity reporting is up to date (90 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/01/2020 28/01/2021 28/01/2022 28/01/2023 28/01/2024
Total gross income £1.76k £1.50k £1.39k £922 £10.05k
Total expenditure £12.79k £12.79k £854 £10.90k £3.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A