Financial history RISBOROUGH COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity Number: 284051
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £47.85k £56.45k £55.62k £52.31k £48.39k
Total expenditure £37.50k £53.52k £44.44k £57.15k £44.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £3.35k