Accounts and annual returns STOWMARKET THORNTREE DAY CENTRE FOR THE ELDERLY MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity number: 284202
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2013 11 February 2014 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2013 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2012 24 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2012 Not Required