Accounts and annual returns BETH SHALOM REFORM SYNAGOGUE
Charity number: 284664
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 17 March 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | 17 March 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 29 February 2008 | 28 July 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2008 | 28 July 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 28 February 2007 | 23 April 2008 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2007 | 04 March 2008 | 67 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window