Accounts and annual returns THE BRITISH GAME AND WILDFOWL TRUST

Charity Number: 285025
Charity reporting is overdue by 935 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 204 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 204 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 570 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 570 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 935 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 935 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 November 2022 380 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 November 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required