Financial history GRANGE FARM CENTRE

Charity number: 285162
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £466.12k £516.72k £466.61k £488.61k £470.17k
Total expenditure £620.34k £572.23k £752.22k £669.54k £697.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £30.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £486.72k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £572.23k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £504.33k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £67.90k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A