Financial history MARCH CHRISTIAN BOOK-SHOP

Charity number: 285270
Charity reporting is up to date (62 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £27.64k £26.78k £31.64k £23.00k £24.95k
Total expenditure £30.74k £19.91k £21.85k £23.12k £27.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £13.91k N/A N/A