Accounts and annual returns THE HEBRIDEAN TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 285629
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 25 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 25 January 2025 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 February 2024 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 27 February 2024 27 days late
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On Time