Financial history CORFE MULLEN VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 286509
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £47.73k £35.86k £10.08k £39.18k £36.03k
Total expenditure £66.41k £55.50k £30.19k £41.86k £52.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.00k £2.00k £6.00k N/A