Accounts and annual returns MELLOW LANE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 286764
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 Not submitted