Governing document THE SOUTHAMPTON NUFFIELD THEATRE TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 286876
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AND ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31ST MARCH 1983 AMENDED 1 NOVEMBER 2000, 30 SEPTEMBER 2004 AND BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 2 OCTOBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 AUG 2018
Charitable objects
THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE CULTIVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN DRAMA, MIME, OPERA, SINGING, MUSIC, DANCE, PAINTING AND SCULPTURE, CINEMA, LITERATURE AND OTHER ARTS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.